This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 04:23:12 (UTC).

Taylor VS Torrid LLC

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Taylor filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Torrid LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1230

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAYLOR , VISA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

TORRID LLC

ROUSE PROPERTIES, INC.

SOUTHLAND MALL, L.P.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ROUSE PROPERTIES, INC.

SOUTHLAND MALL, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PAPPAS, MARK BASIL

BRISBIN, MICHAEL K

NEVIS, CHRISTOPHER J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/11/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

3/11/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Summons Issued and Filed

3/9/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Visa Taylor

3/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Visa Taylor

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

3/9/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

5/27/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

5/27/2021: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Cross-Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

5/27/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Torrid LLC Filed

6/28/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Torrid LLC Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

6/17/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

Tentative Case Management Order

7/7/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement of Visa Taylor Filed

7/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Visa Taylor Filed

Case Management Statement of Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P. Filed

7/8/2021: Case Management Statement of Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

8/20/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/20/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Visa Taylor Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P. Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Torrid LLC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Torrid LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Rouse Properties, Inc. , Southland Mall, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Visa Taylor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less