This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/07/2021 at 11:18:27 (UTC).

Tavira VS General Foundry Service Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Tavira filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against General Foundry Service Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2299

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Other and Plaintiff

TAVIRA, RIVELINO

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant

GENERAL FOUNDRY SERVICE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SZAMET, KELSEY M.

GOLDSTEIN ESQ, CHARLES H

 

Court Documents

Judgment Entire Action Filed

9/1/2021: Judgment Entire Action Filed

Judgment Entered

9/1/2021: Judgment Entered

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/31/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/31/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/27/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Rivelino Tavira

1/20/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Rivelino Tavira

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/31/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Granted

8/31/2021: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Granted

Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Filed for Plaintiff

8/6/2021: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Filed for Plaintiff

Proposed Order Received

4/28/2021: Proposed Order Received

Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

4/28/2021: Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

4/27/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Granted

4/27/2021: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Granted

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

3/12/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Filed for Plaintiff

3/17/2021: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Filed for Plaintiff

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketHearing Restored: Compliance Hearing 04/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Approval of Class Settlement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 04/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Employment As to General Foundry Service Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for General Foundry Service Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court's Notice of Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/20/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 10/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rivelino Tavira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZAMET, KELSEY M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CHARLES