Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 12/26/2020 at 09:15:33 (UTC).

Synnott VS City of Alameda

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 Synnott filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Alameda. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3327

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYNNOTT, JOE

SYNNOTT, TESSA N

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RAITEN, GREGORY

CITY OF ALAMEDA

RAITEN, CHELSEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GORDON, BRYAN A

LE, JOHN D

KOTHARY, PRITESH S.

 

Court Documents

Motion - Dropped

7/29/2020: Motion - Dropped

Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

5/4/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/12/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

3/12/2020: Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

3/12/2020: Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/12/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses Filed

2/11/2020: Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses Filed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

1/27/2020: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

1/27/2020: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

1/27/2020: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to City of Alameda Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to City of Alameda Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Alameda Filed

11/25/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Alameda Filed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

11/12/2019: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

General Denial to Cross-Complaint Filed for Gregory Raiten, Chelsea Raiten

11/7/2019: General Denial to Cross-Complaint Filed for Gregory Raiten, Chelsea Raiten

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/12/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Summons Issued and Filed

10/24/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tessa N Synnott

8/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tessa N Synnott

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

8/30/2019: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Def/xcomplainants... Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMotion Hearing Confirmed for 07/29/2020 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Filed by Gregory Raiten, Chelsea Raiten

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial to Cross-Complaint Filed for Gregory Raiten, Chelsea Raiten

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for City of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for City of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tessa N Synnott

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON, BRYAN A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE, JOHN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOTHARY PRITESH