This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 09:17:19 (UTC).

Sykes VS St. Rose Hospital

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Sykes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against St Rose Hospital. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4398

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYKES, JOHN

Defendants

ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC

ST. ROSE HOSPITAL

HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JAVAHERIZADEH, PARHAM

ALBANESE ESQ, EMILY A.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/6/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

1/6/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 05/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/4/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Sykes

1/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Sykes

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

1/4/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/25/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for St. Rose Hospital

3/1/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for St. Rose Hospital

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC Filed

3/10/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC Filed

Notice of Jury Fees Filed

3/9/2021: Notice of Jury Fees Filed

Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

4/26/2021: Order Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

4/8/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 520; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 10/06/2022 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 10/28/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/27/2022 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/25/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Alecto Healthcare Services, LLC Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for St. Rose Hospital

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/19/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for John Sykes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to John Sykes Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Sykes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALECTO HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. ROSE HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL is a litigant