This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/06/2021 at 03:28:51 (UTC).

Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leas VS Visionary Nutrition, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leas filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Visionary Nutrition, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1854

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMITOMO MITSUI FINANCE AND LEASING COMPANY LIMITED

Defendant

VISIONARY NUTRITION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

POLICAR, RAYMOND A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/27/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Complaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

5/17/2021: Complaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Company Limited

5/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Company Limited

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/17/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

6/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 01/28/2022 02:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sumitomo Mitsui Finance and Leasing Company Limited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Non-PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUMITOMO MITSUI FINANCE AND LEASING COMPANY LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR, RAYMOND A