Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/05/2020 at 00:13:19 (UTC).

Strategic Project Solutions Inc VS Aosky Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Strategic Project Solutions Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Aosky Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1756

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STRATEGIC PROJECT SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

MILLER, CRAIG

SKY PARTNERS INC

AOSKY CORPORATION

ORONSKY, ARNOLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BIRKA-WHITE, DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

4/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

Case Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

5/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

6/3/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

1/24/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

4/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

1/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of Mailing: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order (Amended) Filed

1/22/2020: Notice of Mailing: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order (Amended) Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Arbitration

1/22/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Arbitration

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aosky Corporation Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Aosky Corporation Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sky Partners Inc Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sky Partners Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arnold Oronsky Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arnold Oronsky Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Craig Miller Filed

12/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Craig Miller Filed

Notice of of Mailing: Case Management Order Filed

12/24/2019: Notice of of Mailing: Case Management Order Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 03/27/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

11/5/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/27/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/5/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

11/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Strategic Project Solutions Inc

11/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Strategic Project Solutions Inc

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

11/4/2019: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Strategic Project Solutions Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 06/03/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - for Arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mailing: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order (Amended) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/16/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Mailing: Case Management Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Mailing: Notice of Reassignment of Judge for Purposes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Craig Miller Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Arnold Oronsky Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Sky Partners Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Aosky Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/27/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Strategic Project Solutions Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRKA-WHITE, DAVID M