This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 00:08:32 (UTC).

Stone VS OEM Group, LLP

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Stone filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OEM Group, LLP. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1357

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONE, GRAHAM

Defendant

OEM GROUP, LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VALDEZ, TROY A

CANE, PAUL W.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

5/27/2020: Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

Case Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

5/27/2020: Case Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

6/2/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Graham Stone

1/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Graham Stone

Case Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

1/27/2020: Case Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

1/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/11/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/11/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for OEM Group, LLP

12/13/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for OEM Group, LLP

Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

12/13/2019: Case Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

12/27/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Granted

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/30/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/30/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Filed for Graham Stone

9/27/2019: Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Filed for Graham Stone

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

9/30/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Denied

9/30/2019: Application Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Denied

Opposition of Defendant OEM Group, LLC, to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order F

9/30/2019: Opposition of Defendant OEM Group, LLC, to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order F

Answer to Complaint Filed for OEM Group, LLP

9/20/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for OEM Group, LLP

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 06/02/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Graham Stone Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of OEM Group, LLP Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Graham Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Filed for Graham Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Ex-Parte 09/30/2019 09:00 AM D- 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Reservation Set for dept: 15 date: 09/27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for OEM Group, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to OEM Group, LLP Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/30/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Graham Stone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less