Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 00:57:47 (UTC).

Steel VS Batiste

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Steel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Batiste. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2533

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEEL, KATHY

Defendants

WINGS OF EAGLE MANAGEMENT, LLC

BATISTE, RONALD

EAGLE ENVIRONMENTAL & CONSTRUCTION

WINGS OF EAGLE FUND I, LLC

409 WHITEHALL,LLC, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EEC DEVELOPMENT,LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

385 WHITEHALL,LLC, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

375 WHITEHALL,LLC, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

395 WHITEHALL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STEEL, MICHAEL J.

DRUCH, DARYA SARA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service Filed

5/11/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Supplemental Declaration in Opposition Filed

5/22/2020: Supplemental Declaration in Opposition Filed

Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed

1/14/2020: Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed

Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed

1/14/2020: Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

2/4/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Case Management Statement of Kathy Steel Filed

12/31/2019: Case Management Statement of Kathy Steel Filed

IDC Declaration Filed

9/10/2019: IDC Declaration Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/11/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Appearance of Justin Fisch Filed

8/21/2019: Notice of Appearance of Justin Fisch Filed

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

5/2/2019: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees Filed

General Denial To Complaint Filed for 409 Whitehall,LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company

4/2/2019: General Denial To Complaint Filed for 409 Whitehall,LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company

General Denial To Complaint Filed for 375 Whitehall,LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company

4/2/2019: General Denial To Complaint Filed for 375 Whitehall,LLC, a Georgia Limited Liability Company

Proof of Service Certificate of Service Filed

4/2/2019: Proof of Service Certificate of Service Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

4/19/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Kathy Steel

4/19/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed for Kathy Steel

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Wings of Eagle Fund I, LLC Filed

1/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Wings of Eagle Fund I, LLC Filed

Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Ronald Batiste Filed

1/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Ronald Batiste Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued

2/6/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 517 date: 10/13/2020 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPretrial Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 517 date: 10/02/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 08/24/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/17/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel (Motion); Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Wings of Eagle Management, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Ronald Batiste Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Wings of Eagle Management, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Complaint - Other Contract As to Wings of Eagle Fund I, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/02/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kathy Steel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steel, Michael Jacob