This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/28/2023 at 02:30:08 (UTC).

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT vs CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/07/2022 STATE OF CALIFORNIA, DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7385

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Somnath Raj Chatterjee

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation

State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement

Evan Ross Adams

 

Court Documents

Complaint

09/07/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/07/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons on Complaint

09/07/2022: Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

09/07/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment

09/07/2022: Notice of Case Assignment

Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF EVAN ADAM

10/12/2022: Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF EVAN ADAM

Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State

10/17/2022: Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/12/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

10/12/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Request for Dismissal

10/26/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2022

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 10:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/15/2022; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketMessage: On the Complaint filed by State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement on 09/07/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement as to the entire action; Category: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketMessage: Updated -- Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State: Exact Name: Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve the Secretary of State As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2022

DocketMessage: Ex Parte Proposed Order Signed and Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketMessage: Updated -- Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF EVAN ADAM: Result: Granted Result Date: 10/17/2022; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketMessage: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketMessage: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022

DocketMessage: Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE THE SECRETARY OF STATE; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT; AND DECLARATION OF EVAN ADAM Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022

DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Somnath Raj Chatterjee in Department 517 Hayward Hall of Justice; Category: Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022

DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 10:30 AM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517; Category: Event

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketMessage: Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022

DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: State of California, Department of Industrial Relations, Division of Labor Standards Enforcement (Plaintiff) As to: CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP., a California corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less