This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/05/2020 at 04:32:44 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company VS Whitlock

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Whitlock. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8093

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATEFARM MITUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

WHITLOCK , JAZMYN NICOLE

ARI FLEET MANAGEMENT

HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MAHFOUZ II, RICHARD L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/8/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 03/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

10/8/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/7/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Statefarm Mitual AutoMobile Insurance Company

10/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Statefarm Mitual AutoMobile Insurance Company

Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

10/7/2019: Complaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Holman Automotive Group Inc Filed

10/16/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Holman Automotive Group Inc Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

10/31/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

10/29/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Holman Automotive Group Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/06/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Statefarm Mitual AutoMobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Insurance Coverage Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARI Fleet Management Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where StateFarm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant