This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 01:36:52 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company VS Doe 1

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Doe 1. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5932

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

DOE 1

PETES MOVING SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REESE ESQ, BREANNE L

GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Venue Filed

6/25/2020: Declaration of Venue Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

6/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

6/25/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/25/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/29/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 11/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

6/29/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 11/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Petes Moving Services, LLC Filed

7/27/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Petes Moving Services, LLC Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC

8/31/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

11/5/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Case Management Statement of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

11/30/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 03/08/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/08/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 12/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Petes Moving Services, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Petes Moving Services, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/25/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETE'S MOVING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARFINKEL, GREGG S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REESE BREANNE L.