This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 04:28:33 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company VS Askew

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Askew. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8104

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ASKEW, ANTONIE DWIGHT

NUNEZ, SILVANI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ESPINOSA ESQ, TRISTAN P

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 06/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

2/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 06/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/4/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

2/4/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Declaration Of Venue Filed

2/4/2021: Declaration Of Venue Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/21/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ESPINOSA, TRISTAN P.