This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 10:43:25 (UTC).

Squitiero VS Vergara

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Squitiero filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Vergara. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1824

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SQUITIERO, PATRICIA

Defendants

VERGARA, JOSE FELIX

DE JESUS, GREGORY SANTOS

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

1/30/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

1/31/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

1/6/2020: Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

1/6/2020: Proof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim Filed

1/10/2020: Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim Filed

Answer to Request for Order Filed

12/27/2019: Answer to Request for Order Filed

Motion: To Strike Counter Claim Filed

12/31/2019: Motion: To Strike Counter Claim Filed

Small Claims Law and Motion 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

1/3/2020: Small Claims Law and Motion 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: SC-105 Request for Court Order and Answer

12/23/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: SC-105 Request for Court Order and Answer

Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/24/2019: Amendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/9/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

12/2/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

Answer of Jose Felix Vergara to Plaintiff's Claim and Special Motion Filed

11/14/2019: Answer of Jose Felix Vergara to Plaintiff's Claim and Special Motion Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/4/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Other Ex Parte 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion: To Strike Counter Claim 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Counterclaim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Subpoena/Subpoena Duces Tecum Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Law and Motion 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketMotion: To Strike Counter Claim 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: To Strike Counter Claim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Request for Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: SC-105 Request for Court Order and Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Subpoena Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Defendant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketClaim of Defendant Filed for Jose Felix Vergara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer of Jose Felix Vergara to Plaintiff's Claim and Special Motion Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less