This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 03:20:45 (UTC).

Sperandeo VS Santander Consumer USA Inc

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Sperandeo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Santander Consumer USA Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1489

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPERANDEO, SALVATORE J JR

Defendant

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

7/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

7/21/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

6/8/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

6/12/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/15/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

5/20/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr Filed

5/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr Filed

Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Order Filed

2/10/2020: Returned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Order Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Santander Consumer USA Inc Filed

2/26/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Santander Consumer USA Inc Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

1/27/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/27/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/23/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr

1/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr

Complaint - Other Employment Filed

1/23/2020: Complaint - Other Employment Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/25/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Santander Consumer USA Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/15/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Salvatore J Sperandeo Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOUGH, MARY PATRICIA