Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 18:42:23 (UTC).

Spencer VS The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Spencer filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against The Permanente Medical Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1614

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER, JAHCARI

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLANS, INC.

THE PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

HSU, DANIEL TUAN-TU M.D

NIIZAWA, CHARLENE M. M.D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

OWENS, MARQUIS D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

3/12/2021: Complaint Medical Malpractice Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jahcari Spencer

3/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jahcari Spencer

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/12/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

3/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/05/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jahcari Spencer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Medical Malpractice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OWENS, MARQUIS D.