This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 12:49:16 (UTC).

Southwest Concrete Structures, Inc. VS Nautilus Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Southwest Concrete Structures, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nautilus Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9210

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOUTHWEST CONCRETE STUCTURES, INC.

SOUTHWEST CONCRETE STRUCTURES, INC.

Defendants

TELEGRAPH 1 NUEN OWNER, LLC

NAUTILUS GROUP, INC.

RAD URBAN, AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

600 MINNESOTA STREET, LP

RAD BUILDERS, LLC

MILLER, RANDALL DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PICOZZI, EDWARD M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/10/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

5/11/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Tentative Case Management Order

5/6/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/12/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/15/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/15/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Application Re: Amend Complaint Granted

8/25/2021: Application Re: Amend Complaint Granted

Summons on Complaint Issued

8/25/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued

Application Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc.

8/18/2021: Application Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc.

Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

8/2/2021: Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Telegraph 1 Nuen Owner, LLC Filed

12/24/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Telegraph 1 Nuen Owner, LLC Filed

Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

12/24/2020: Case Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/27/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 20; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Nautilus Group, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Nautilus Group, Inc. Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Nautilus Group, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Amend Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Amend Complaint Filed for Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration ISO Order Allowing Pltf to File Second Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Telegraph 1 Nuen Owner, LLC Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Telegraph 1 Nuen Owner, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 01/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Southwest Concrete Stuctures, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 600 MINNESOTA STREET LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICOZZI, EDWARD M