This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:04:34 (UTC).

Southland Mall L.P. a Delawar VS OCB Restaurant Company LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Southland Mall L P a Delawar filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OCB Restaurant Company LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4603

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHLAND MALL L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

OCB RESTAURANT COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KACHMAN, KEVIN A.

 

Court Documents

Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Automatic Stay Filed

5/13/2021: Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Automatic Stay Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

4/12/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/12/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership

3/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

3/22/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/22/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership Filed

7/20/2021: Case Management Statement of Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 03/24/2022 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy and Notice of Automatic Stay Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/04/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Southland Mall L.P. a Delaware limited partnership

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less