This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 12:32:32 (UTC).

Southern Wine & Spirits of Northern VS J's Mexican Food Inc

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 Southern Wine Spirits of Northern filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against J's Mexican Food Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is REBEKAH EVENSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2996

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

REBEKAH EVENSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA

Defendant

J'S MEXICAN FOOD INC

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

1/28/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

4/29/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

7/7/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

7/7/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Rebekah Evenson; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 07/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 05/06/2020 01:30 PM D- 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN WINE & SPIRITS OF NOTHERN CALIFORNIA is a litigant