Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/14/2021 at 01:34:40 (UTC).

Sogliuzzo VS Pope

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 Sogliuzzo filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pope. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are NOEL WISE and NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1231

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

NOEL WISE

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOGLIUZZO, LISA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WAN, THERESA

SIMMONS, SHANA ALEXANDRA

POPE, CHRISTOPHER

WAN, PAK

VANGUARD PROPERTIES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BUSS, LUKE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SIMMONS, SHANA ALEXANDRA

POPE, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GIAMPAOLI, LISA

GELINI, THOMAS S.

JIRN, JAMES J.

BEEMAN, CHRISTOPHER J.

HARRIS, DAVID E

MONTALVO, JOSE A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

9/9/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

8/31/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Case Management Conf Continuance 09/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

12/10/2019: Case Management Conf Continuance 09/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

8/16/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Notice of Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

7/15/2019: Notice of Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Christopher Pope, Shana Alexandra Simmon

6/27/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Christopher Pope, Shana Alexandra Simmon

Amended Notice of Motion Filed

5/20/2019: Amended Notice of Motion Filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

5/3/2019: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit Filed

First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

4/12/2019: First Amended Cross-Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pak Wan Filed

2/20/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pak Wan Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

2/20/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Pak Wan, Theresa Wan

2/27/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Pak Wan, Theresa Wan

Proof of Service by Mail Answer Filed

2/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Answer Filed

Cross-Complaint Filed for Christopher Pope, Shana Alexandra Simmons

3/25/2019: Cross-Complaint Filed for Christopher Pope, Shana Alexandra Simmons

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/3/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

1/3/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Sogliuzzo

1/3/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Sogliuzzo

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Compliance Hearing dept: 24 date: 10/16/2020 time: 09:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 10/26/2020 09:30 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Pretrial Conference 10/16/2020 10:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Pak Wan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/20/2019 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Lisa Sogliuzzo Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Lisa Sogliuzzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Sogliuzzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VANGUARD PROPERTIES, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIRN, JAMES J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harris, David Evan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEEMAN, CHRISTOPHER J.