This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 21:22:01 (UTC).

SO WINE & SPIRITS VS PITAMBER

Case Summary

On 03/26/1998 SO WINE SPIRITS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PITAMBER. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GAIL HASHIMOTO and FREMONT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8460

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

GAIL HASHIMOTO

FREMONT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

SO. WINE & SPIRITS OF NO. CALIF.

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

PITAMBER, RAMESH

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

8/13/1998: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

Judgment Entered

7/10/1998: Judgment Entered

Ruling Taken Under Submission

7/9/1998: Ruling Taken Under Submission

Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

7/9/1998: Declaration of Non-Military Service Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

7/9/1998: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

6/4/1998: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

5/18/1998: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Gail Hashimoto; Department: Dept 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Fremont Judge Pro Tem; Department: Dept 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 6 date: 07/09/1998 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/1998
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to RAMESH PITAMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/1998
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 06/04/1998 08:30:00 AM D-6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/1998
  • DocketCLAIM OF PLAINTIFF, ORDER ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less