This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 01:47:28 (UTC).

Smithey VS J.C. Penney Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Smithey filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against J C Penney Company, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN KAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9816

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN KAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITHEY, MARISSA

SMITHEY, SETH

Defendants

J.C. PENNEY COMPANY, INC.

MAROUF, KHALIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KLEIN, ANTHONY J.

ROTH, DAVID V.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

10/5/2020: Case Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

Notice of Correcting Mailing Address Filed

6/8/2020: Notice of Correcting Mailing Address Filed

Case Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

5/11/2020: Case Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

Case Management Statement of J.C. Penney Company, Inc. Filed

5/11/2020: Case Management Statement of J.C. Penney Company, Inc. Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

5/11/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

5/12/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Notice of of Pendency of Bankruptcy for J.C. Penney Company, Inc., etc. al and Automatic Stay of Pro

5/19/2020: Notice of of Pendency of Bankruptcy for J.C. Penney Company, Inc., etc. al and Automatic Stay of Pro

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for J.C. Penney Company, Inc.

3/5/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for J.C. Penney Company, Inc.

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Khalida Marouf Filed

2/28/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Khalida Marouf Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.C. Penney Company, Inc. Filed

2/20/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to J.C. Penney Company, Inc. Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/10/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

1/10/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Seth Smithey

1/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Seth Smithey

Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed

1/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

1/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 19; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2021 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correcting Mailing Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Kaus; Department: Dept 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/20/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Seth Smithey, Marissa Smithey Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for J.C. Penney Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Khalida Marouf Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to J.C. Penney Company, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Seth Smithey

    Read MoreRead Less