This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 07:31:15 (UTC).

Smith VS Simon

Case Summary

On 07/02/2009 Smith filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Simon. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN PORTER and DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0811

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JOHN PORTER

DOUGLAS UNSWORTH, PORE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SMITH, RYAN A

Respondent

SIMON, RODNEY JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LIPKIN, JERRY I.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • DocketPetition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: Douglas Unsworth, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment 11/12/2009 08:30 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketReissuance of Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment; Judge: John Porter; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • DocketAmended Civil Harassment Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment 08/13/2009 08:30 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - CLETS on Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment As to Ryan A Smit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2009
  • DocketAnswer To Request For Orders To Stop Harassment (Civil Harassment) Filed for Rodney Simon Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2009
  • DocketProof of Service on Petition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment As to Rodney Simon Jr Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketMiscellaneous TRO Granted Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • DocketCivil Harassment 07/16/2009 08:30 AM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketDeclaration re Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Harassment and Temporary Restraining Order Filed for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DocketPetition for Injunction Prohibiting Harassment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less