Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 05:44:38 (UTC).

Smith VS Peterson Dean, Inc

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Smith filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Peterson Dean, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6296

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH, ALICE

SMITH, WILLIE

Defendant

PETERSON DEAN, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ENYINWA, EMMANUEL

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

 

Court Documents

Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Peterson Dean, Inc

6/19/2020: Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Peterson Dean, Inc

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

3/9/2020: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/18/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

2/19/2020: Notice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Peterson Dean, Inc

11/26/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Peterson Dean, Inc

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

12/10/2019: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/18/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

12/12/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/18/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Statement of Peterson Dean, Inc Filed

2/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Peterson Dean, Inc Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/11/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

5/21/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 09/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/21/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/31/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Willie Smith

4/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Willie Smith

Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed

4/24/2019: Complaint - Professional Negligence Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/24/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Peterson Dean, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: ADR; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Mediation Referral Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketReferred to Court Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/18/2019 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/06/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketReturned Check for Receipt RCD856841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Professional Negligence Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Willie Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETERSEN-DEAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILIONIS, GEORGE K