This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/01/2020 at 20:41:59 (UTC).

Smith VS Guillot

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Smith filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Guillot. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9668

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, LETTA

Defendants

GUILLOT, CURLY J.

PERRY, LA STACY R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/26/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Curly J. Guillot

3/9/2020: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Curly J. Guillot

General Denial To Complaint Filed for La Stacy R. Perry

3/9/2020: General Denial To Complaint Filed for La Stacy R. Perry

Declaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

2/7/2020: Declaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

Declaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

2/7/2020: Declaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to La Stacy R. Perry Filed

2/14/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to La Stacy R. Perry Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Curly J. Guillot Filed

2/14/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Curly J. Guillot Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

1/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/13/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/9/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Letta Smith

1/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Letta Smith

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

1/9/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNotice: Waiver of Court Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/12/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for La Stacy R. Perry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for La Stacy R. Perry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Curly J. Guillot Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Curly J. Guillot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Curly J. Guillot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Curly J. Guillot Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to La Stacy R. Perry Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Letta Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less