Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 09:08:12 (UTC).

Smirnova VS Nekortstnov

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Smirnova filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nekortstnov. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5578

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMIRNOVA , SVETLANA

Defendant

NEKORTSTNOV , MIKHAIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZELLER, MARK EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

4/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/15/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Svetlana Smirnova

4/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Svetlana Smirnova

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/15/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Svetlana Smirnova

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZELLER, MARK EDWARD