This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 06:55:30 (UTC).

Slade VS Empire Today, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/20/2020 Slade filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Empire Today, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0698

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SLADE , JEUL

Defendant

EMPIRE TODAY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SETAREH, SHAUN

FARAG, SHAREEF S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 02/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

12/2/2020: Case Management Conference 02/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Order Granting Motion to Remand; Denying Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration as Moot; Vacating Hear

5/6/2021: Order Granting Motion to Remand; Denying Renewed Motion to Compel Arbitration as Moot; Vacating Hear

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

7/19/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Action with Prejudice Filed

8/2/2021: Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss Action with Prejudice Filed

Declaration of David Keledjian in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

8/2/2021: Declaration of David Keledjian in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

Evidentiary Objections in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

8/2/2021: Evidentiary Objections in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

Declaration of Jeul Slade ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

8/2/2021: Declaration of Jeul Slade ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

8/4/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/11/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

8/13/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission

8/13/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission

Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

8/19/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

Answer to Complaint Filed for Empire Today, LLC

12/21/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Empire Today, LLC

Notice of Removal Filed for Empire Today, LLC

12/23/2020: Notice of Removal Filed for Empire Today, LLC

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/6/2021: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

1/6/2021: Motion Granted

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/6/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Empire Today, LLC Filed

12/1/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Empire Today, LLC Filed

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel (Motion); Judge: Winifred Y. Smith; Department: Dept 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Jeul Slade ISO Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvidentiary Objections in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of David Keledjian in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal Filed for Empire Today, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Empire Today, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/09/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 01/06/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Empire Today, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeul Slade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Empire Today LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARAG SHAREEF