This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/05/2020 at 15:41:10 (UTC).

Singleton VS California Highway Patrol

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Singleton filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against California Highway Patrol. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is C. DON CLAY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0555

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

C. DON CLAY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGLETON, DUANE

Defendants

CHP OFFICER L.CHILDRESS 20961

D. RAMIREZ-MEZA 21364

OPD OFFICERS K. ALBINO 9745

K. WALKER 21271

D. FULMORE 9575

SERGEANT M. NGUYEN 8775

CALIFORNIA HIGHWAY PATROL

OAKLAND POLICE DEPARTMENT

CHP OFFICERS E. JAUREGIN 20986

CITY OF OAKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SIDELNIKOV, VADIM

VINCENT, JEFFREY R

 

Court Documents

Order from DCA Filed

6/15/2020: Order from DCA Filed

Order from DCA Filed

6/18/2020: Order from DCA Filed

Order from DCA Filed

6/23/2020: Order from DCA Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

2/27/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

2/24/2020: Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

2/27/2020: Receipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

2/26/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed

2/14/2020: Notice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

2/5/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Duane Singleton

2/7/2020: Notice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Duane Singleton

Designation of Record Filed

2/7/2020: Designation of Record Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

12/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

1/6/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Judgment Dismissal Filed

1/6/2020: Judgment Dismissal Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

12/27/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

12/27/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

1/2/2020: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

1/3/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder from DCA Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder from DCA Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder from DCA Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020
View Court Documents

DocketReceipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketReceipt for Notice of Appeal by DCA Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketDesignation of Record Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appeal (Unlimited) Filed by Duane Singleton

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
58 More Docket Entries
07/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by California Highway Patrol, CHP Officers E. Jauregin 20986, CHP Office

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2019
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to California Highway Patrol Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSupplement Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 6

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Duane Singleton Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019

DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Duane Singleton

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Duane Singleton

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less