Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 01:42:21 (UTC).

Singh VS Kondragunta

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 Singh filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Kondragunta. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9072

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGH , AMANINDER PAL

Defendants

SEANET PV, LLC

LOBSTAR VENTURE, LLC

SEANET RWC LLC

DEUTSCH, RUSSELL

OPLS LOS ALTOS, LLC

KONDRAGUNTA , SRISHA

OPLS PORTOLA VALLEY , LLC

KONDRAGUNTA , KISHORE

PILLARISETTY, HIRNI

PILLARISETTY, SRIDHAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MINTER, PHILIP D.

NELLARI, CHARLES

JAHANGIRI, LUBNA K.

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

4/7/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/2/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/2/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/24/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/24/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Hearing Filed

12/1/2020: Notice of Hearing Filed

Case Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

12/8/2020: Case Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

9/24/2020: Demurrer Sustained With Leave to Amend

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Second Amended Complaint Filed

11/26/2019: Second Amended Complaint Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

8/7/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

8/9/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

8/13/2019: Case Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

5/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketTR - Demurrer to Complaint - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Amaninder Pal Singh Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Dismiss Sireesha Kondragunta and Harini Pillaris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Demurrer to Complaint; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 15 date: 04/08/2021 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint Filed by Kishore Kondragunta, Srisha Kondragunta, Sridhar Pillarisetty, Hirni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 08/20/2019 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Russell Deutsch, OPLS Portola Valley , LLC , OPLS Los Altos, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re: Motion to strike and Demurrer to Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/16/2019 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Amaninder Pal Singh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINTER, PHILIP D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAHANGIRI, LUBNA K.