This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 00:56:09 (UTC).

Simotas VS Dorfman

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Simotas filed a Family - Minor Custody lawsuit against Dorfman. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNA WHITMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7271

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Minor Custody

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JENNA WHITMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SIMOTAS, STEPHANIE MARIE

Respondent

DORFMAN, JUSTIN ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MORRISON, HOWARD

KANE, HOWARD E.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order re:...; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketRFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service Electronic Service Re: Findings and Order After Hearing - 3/10/2021 Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketFindings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketChild Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Request for Order re:...; Judge: Jenna Whitman; Department: Dept 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 507 date: 08/25/2021 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketReferred to Family Court Services

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice Upon Exparte Application for Orders Filed by Justin Robert Dorfman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Justin Robert Dorfman Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Justin Robert Dorfman Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Default or Uncontested Judgment Filed for Stephanie Marie Simotas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children As to Justin Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPetition for Custody and Support of Minor Children Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANE, HOWARD E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morrison, Howard Esq.