This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 04:04:51 (UTC).

Sieber VS Heithaus

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Sieber filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Heithaus. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6280

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIEBER , TIFFANY

Defendants

HEITHAUS , MARIA

KIM , DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROWN, BRODERICK H.

ANGSTADT, TODD A.

BELL, SHADAE S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/24/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/24/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/19/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

4/1/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

4/5/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Notice of Settlement Filed for Tiffany Sieber

2/16/2021: Notice of Settlement Filed for Tiffany Sieber

Case Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

3/9/2021: Case Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

11/19/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Case Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

10/26/2020: Case Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

Case Management Statement of Tiffany Sieber Filed

10/30/2020: Case Management Statement of Tiffany Sieber Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Maria Heithaus, David Kim

8/31/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Maria Heithaus, David Kim

Notice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

8/31/2020: Notice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

6/26/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tiffany Sieber

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tiffany Sieber

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/26/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

7/1/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 11/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

7/1/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/27/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Tiffany Sieber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Tiffany Sieber Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Maria Heithaus, David Kim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Maria Heithaus, David Kim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/19/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tiffany Sieber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELL, SHADAE S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, BRODERICK H.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGSTADT, TODD A.