This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 04:33:31 (UTC).

Shields VS SF Bay Area Rapid Transit District

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Shields filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SF Bay Area Rapid Transit District. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is NOL WISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3636

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRUZ, YANETH

SHIELDS, AYANNA

Defendants

ESTATE OF JEROME GRIER

GRIER, JEROME

SF BAY AREA RAPID TRANSIT DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CARTON, MARK

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

9/29/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint - Auto Tort Dismissed

9/30/2020: Complaint - Auto Tort Dismissed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/14/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

9/6/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9/6/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ayanna Shields

9/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ayanna Shields

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

9/4/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/30/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/02/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ayanna Shields

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTON, MARK