This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 15:22:03 (UTC).

Sharifi VS Manos Home Care, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Sharifi filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Manos Home Care, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Delbert Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0485

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Delbert Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sumiaya Sharifi

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MANOS HOME CARE, INC.

REGIONAL CENTER OF THE EAST BAY, INC.

Howard Young

Brian Beck

Frohar Sharifi

Kiara Roberson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Ahmed Ibrahim

E. Forrest Shryock, Jr.

Mark D. Fenske

Olga Y Bryan

Peter M. Hughes

Robert S. Aaron

 

Court Documents

Tentative Case Management Order

7/14/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

3/5/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Answer to 1st Amended Cross-Complaint Filed for Howard Young

9/7/2021: Answer to 1st Amended Cross-Complaint Filed for Howard Young

Cross-Complaint Filed for Howard Young

9/7/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Howard Young

Answer to Complaint Filed for Frohar Sharifi

8/17/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Frohar Sharifi

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/19/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/19/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frohar Sharifi Filed

7/19/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Frohar Sharifi Filed

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

7/14/2021: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Cross-Complaint Filed for Manos Home Care, Inc.

7/14/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Manos Home Care, Inc.

Cross-Complaint Filed for Regional Center of The East Bay, Inc.

5/24/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Regional Center of The East Bay, Inc.

Declaration Declaration of Ahmed Ibrahim in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Conference

04/22/2022: Declaration Declaration of Ahmed Ibrahim in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Conference

Proof of Personal Service

04/01/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Order

03/15/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/15/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

02/28/2022: Case Management Statement

RETURNED MAIL Amendment to Cross-Complaint

02/14/2022: RETURNED MAIL Amendment to Cross-Complaint

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

02/01/2022: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Sumiaya Sharifi (Plaintiff):Name Suffix: blankMiddle Name: blank; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Declaration Declaration of Ahmed Ibrahim in Support of Plaintiff's Request for Informal Discovery Conference Filed by: Sumiaya Sharifi (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Regional Center of The East Bay, Inc. (Cross-Complainant) As to: Brian Beck (Cross-Defendant) Service Date: 03/29/2022 Service Cost: 210.00 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Manos Home Care, Inc. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: RETURNED MAIL Amendment to Cross-Complaint Filed by: Clerk As to: Howard Young (Cross-Complainant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Result: Granted Result Date: 02/01/2022; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Sumiaya Sharifi Denied; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem As to Sumiaya Sharifi Denied; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 07/19/2021 03:00 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Sumiaya Sharifi; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Application Re: Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Filed for Sumiaya Sharifi; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sumiaya Sharifi; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less