Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/12/2020 at 01:44:03 (UTC).

Second Round Sub, LLC VS Jones

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 Second Round Sub, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL D. HERBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7904

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

PAUL D. HERBERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC

Defendant

JONES, TIFFANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KUMAR ESQ, MATTHEW J

 

Court Documents

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

12/13/2019: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Tiffany Jones Filed

6/10/2019: Case Management Statement of Tiffany Jones Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tiffany Jones Filed

6/12/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tiffany Jones Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/9/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/9/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

4/18/2019: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Tiffany Jones

4/30/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Tiffany Jones

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

4/30/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

5/1/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 07/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/1/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Second Round Sub, LLC

2/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Second Round Sub, LLC

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/21/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Collections Filed

2/21/2019: Complaint - Collections Filed

Declaration Filed

2/21/2019: Declaration Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Collections; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Paul D. Herbert; Department: Dept 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 12/13/2019 02:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tiffany Jones Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Tiffany Jones Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/09/2019 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Tiffany Jones Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Tiffany Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Tiffany Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRelease of Funds Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Second Round Sub, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND ROUND SUB LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK J.CREW is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kumar, Matthew J