This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 20:20:12 (UTC).

Scoggins VS CBS Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 Scoggins filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CBS Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2079

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Defendants

CBS CORPORATION

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC

MC NALLY INDUSTRIES LLC

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC

UNITED TECHOLIGIES CORPORATION

OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PFIZER INC

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD

THE LINCOLE ELECTRIC COMPANY

HOBART BROTHERS LLC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC

STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS ( USA) LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

ECODYNE CORPORATION

SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

34 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

03/07/2022: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance

Case Management Statement

12/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

12/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

12/02/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

01/15/2021: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Proposed Order

01/15/2021: Proposed Order

Declaration in Support

01/15/2021: Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support

01/15/2021: Declaration in Support

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

01/15/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

01/15/2021: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Proposed Order

01/15/2021: Proposed Order

Proposed Order

01/15/2021: Proposed Order

Declaration in Support

01/15/2021: Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support

01/15/2021: Declaration in Support

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

01/15/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Index of Exhibits

01/15/2021: Index of Exhibits

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

01/15/2021: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

338 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice Notice of Remote Appearance Filed by: Armstrong International Inc (Defendant); Keenan Properties, Inc (Defendant) As to: David M Scoggins (Plaintiff); Alyce Ma Scoggins (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/07/2022; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint filed by Scoggins on 11/07/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by David M Scoggins and Alyce Ma Scoggins as to the entire action; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: David M Scoggins (Plaintiff); Alyce Ma Scoggins (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Designated Defense Counsel (Other Third Party); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint filed by Scoggins on 11/07/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by David M Scoggins and Alyce Ma Scoggins as to United Techoligies Corporation; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: David M Scoggins (Plaintiff) As to: United Techoligies Corporation (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from 10/28/2021 to 11/15/2021 Status changed from Filed and Received to Filed; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Amended Complaint filed by Scoggins on 11/07/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by David M Scoggins and Alyce Ma Scoggins as to J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc; Category: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request for Dismissal Filed and Received by: David M Scoggins (Plaintiff); Alyce Ma Scoggins (Plaintiff) As to: J-M Manufacturing Company, Ic (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
397 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Trane U.S. Inc; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ingersoll-Rand Company; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for The Goodyear Tir & Rubber Company; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 01/10/2020 09:15 AM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMessage: First Amended Complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for David M Scoggins; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less