This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 01:58:42 (UTC).

Scio Inc., a California corporation VS Clovity Inc

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 Scio Inc , a California corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clovity Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6541

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCIO INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SACHDEVA, ANUJ

CLOVITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BORGER, JOSHUA J

KHAN, MOHAMMAD N

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

1/28/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Summons Issued and Filed

9/8/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

8/17/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

8/23/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Case Management Statement of Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva Filed

8/24/2021: Case Management Statement of Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva Filed

Case Management Statement of Scio Inc., a California corporation Filed

8/24/2021: Case Management Statement of Scio Inc., a California corporation Filed

Second Amended Complaint Filed

8/26/2021: Second Amended Complaint Filed

Proposed Order Filed

6/30/2021: Proposed Order Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

6/24/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/24/2021: First Amended Complaint Filed

Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Scio Inc., a California corporation

5/26/2021: Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by Scio Inc., a California corporation

Answer to Complaint Filed for Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva

4/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Clovity Inc Filed

2/11/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Clovity Inc Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

1/15/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Scio Inc., a California corporation

1/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Scio Inc., a California corporation

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

1/15/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/28/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by E-Mail or Electronic Service of Summons on Second Amended Complaint; Second Amen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 11/04/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Scio Inc., a California corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 06/24/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint Filed by Scio Inc., a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Clovity Inc, Anuj Sachdeva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Clovity Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Anuj Sachdeva Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Scio Inc., a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLOVITY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Khan, Mohammad N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borger, Joshua J