Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 01:39:51 (UTC).

Schneider VS ALFA Laval, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Schneider filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALFA Laval, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN, MICHAEL M. MARKMAN and JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8401

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OKA, ANN M.

SCHNEIDER, KARL F.

Defendants

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA, THE

ALFA LAVAL, INC.

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

BW/IP, INC.

ALLIED PACKING & SUPPLY, INC.

CRANE CO.

CARRIER CORPORATION

ATLAS HEATING & VENTILATING CO., LTD.

YARWAY CORPORATION

GRINNELL LLC

SPX FLOW, INC.

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, THE

GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.

TRANE U.S., INC.

LUFKIN INDUSTRIES, INC.

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORP.

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

AMELL, DAVID L.

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

CROCHET, CARLA LYNN

EAGAN JR, MICHAEL Q.

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

YUEN, NICOLE BROWN

OBERG, LISA L.

MCCAFFERY, TIMOTHY J.

NICHOLS, STEPHEN M.

PRINDLE, KENNETH B.

LOVE, MARK A

MANOLI, C.J.

CORDERY, THEODORE T

AMEELE, KEITH M.

ESTRADA, MICHAEL J.

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES P.

CALARESO, CHRISTINE D.

POND, FRANK D.

FRAENKEL ESQ, CONSTANCE

TORRES, JULIE

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/28/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

5/16/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

1/27/2021: Notice of of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

Tentative Case Management Order

1/15/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/12/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Trane U.S., Inc.

5/11/2020: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Trane U.S., Inc.

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/31/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/30/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Trane U.S., Inc. Filed

9/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Trane U.S., Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to FMC Corporation Filed

9/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to FMC Corporation Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Consolidated Insulation, Inc. Filed

9/23/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Consolidated Insulation, Inc. Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/13/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The

8/9/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karl F. Schneider

7/24/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karl F. Schneider

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Informal Discovery Conference Request re: to Discovery Responses Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Madison BN, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Eclipse, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Karl F. Schneider, Ann M. Oka Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
175 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Ingersoll-Rand Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/13/2019 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Graybar Electric Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, The

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 09/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Karl F. Schneider

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPX FLOW, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LUFKIN INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ATLAS HEATING & VENTILATING CO., LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant