This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 01:52:47 (UTC).

Schmidt VS Toyota Motor Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Schmidt filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Delbert Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6339

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Delbert Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy Arthur Schmidt

Defendants

NEW UNITED MOTOR MANUFACTURING, INC

TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION

TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Daniel Dell'osso

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Order

03/18/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

03/18/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Order

11/30/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/30/2021: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/23/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

07/23/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Statement Re: CMC Set for July 23, 2021 Filed

07/14/2021: Statement Re: CMC Set for July 23, 2021 Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

03/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

03/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

07/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2021 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514 updated: Result Date to 11/30/2021 Result Type to Held - Continued; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/18/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conf Continuance 11/30/2021 03:00 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Order Issued; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement of Jeremy Arthur Schmidt Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Toyota Motor North America Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to New United Motor Manufacturing, Inc Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 07/28/2020 08:30 AM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeremy Arthur Schmidt; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Product Liability Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New United Motor Manufacturing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Dell'Osso