Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 05:09:33 (UTC).

SAVAGE VS AC TRANSIT

Case Summary

On 02/24/1997 SAVAGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AC TRANSIT. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Wiley W Manuel Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM DUNBAR, PATRICK J. ZIKA and TALLY CRAIG -. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3562

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wiley W Manuel Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

WILLIAM DUNBAR

PATRICK J. ZIKA

TALLY CRAIG -

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

SAVAGE, ENZOR

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

MCKENZIE, ROY T MACK

ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Cross Defendant

MCKENZIE, MACK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JONES, DARREL T.

 

Court Documents

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

6/11/1998: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed

7/16/1998: Summons w/o Proof of Service Filed

Answer To Complaint Filed for ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

8/20/1998: Answer To Complaint Filed for ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Mack McKenzie Filed

9/15/1998: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Mack McKenzie Filed

Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

10/20/1998: Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff

Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

10/27/1998: Memo to Set - Counter Filed for Defendant

Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints 01/19/1999 02:02 PM D- 14

12/18/1998: Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints 01/19/1999 02:02 PM D- 14

Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints 04/30/1999 02:02 PM D- 18

3/11/1999: Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints 04/30/1999 02:02 PM D- 18

Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints Commenced and Completed

4/30/1999: Civil OSC - Cross-Complaints Commenced and Completed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

5/6/1999: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Settlement Conference Statement Filed for Defendant

7/9/1999: Settlement Conference Statement Filed for Defendant

Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed

7/12/1999: Application Re: Telephone Standby Filed

Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted

7/14/1999: Application Re: Telephone Standby Granted

Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

7/19/1999: Judge's Memo to Clerk: Settlement Conference

Notice of Settlement Filed

11/10/1999: Notice of Settlement Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY F

12/20/1999: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY F

Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

12/20/1999: Civil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

General Civil Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff

4/6/2000: General Civil Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Default Civil Judgment; Judge: William Dunbar; Department: Dept 133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Civil Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Uncontested Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Hearing Dropped from dept: 135 date: 04/24/2000 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Uncontested 04/06/2000 08:30 AM D- 133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2000
  • DocketMinutes: Status re: Settlement; Judge: Patrick J. Zika; Department: Dept 135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2000
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 135 date: 04/24/2000 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2000
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons w/o Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 09/14/1998 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to ALAMEDA CONTRA COSTA TRANSIT AUTHORITY, ROY T MACK MCKENZIE Fil

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1998
  • DocketMinutes: Failure to Comply with Local Rules 5.0; Judge: Tally Craig - Pro Tem; Department: Dept 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1998
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil OSC - Complaints dept: 14 date: 07/16/1998 time: 02:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/1998
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil OSC - Complaints 06/11/1998 02:00 PM D- 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/1997
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/1997
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED: NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less