Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 03:59:44 (UTC).

Sanford VS Sanford

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Sanford filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sanford. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS HAYASHI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0529

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DENNIS HAYASHI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

SANFORD, SHARON

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

SANFORD, SHAYLA

SANFORD, JOHNNY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PICONE, STEPHEN S.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/28/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Judgment Entire Action Filed

1/27/2021: Judgment Entire Action Filed

Judgment Entered

1/27/2021: Judgment Entered

Declaration of Sharon Sanford in support of Request for Quiet Title Judgment Filed

1/14/2021: Declaration of Sharon Sanford in support of Request for Quiet Title Judgment Filed

Proposed Judgment Received

1/11/2021: Proposed Judgment Received

Hearing Reset to Prove Up Hearing 01/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

12/3/2020: Hearing Reset to Prove Up Hearing 01/13/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Case Management Statement of Sharon Sanford Filed

10/19/2020: Case Management Statement of Sharon Sanford Filed

Case Management Statement of Sharon Sanford Filed

9/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Sharon Sanford Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Shayla Sanford Entered

9/3/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Shayla Sanford Entered

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Johnny Sanford, Shayla Sanford Filed

7/1/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Johnny Sanford, Shayla Sanford Filed

Verification for Complaint to Quiet Title to Real Property Filed

5/29/2020: Verification for Complaint to Quiet Title to Real Property Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

5/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

6/2/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Other Real Property; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProve Up Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Ryan Ramseyer Regarding Compliance with Court's Order of 1/13/21 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Sharon Sanford in support of Request for Quiet Title Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Other Real Property; Judge: Dennis Hayashi; Department: Dept 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Prove Up Hearing dept: 518 date: 01/27/2021 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProve Up Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Johnny Sanford, Shayla Sanford Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Johnny Sanford, Shayla Sanford Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerification for Complaint to Quiet Title to Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/28/2020 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sharon Sanford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PICONE, STEPHEN S.