This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 01:08:07 (UTC).

Sanders VS Sun Communities, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Sanders filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sun Communities, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1949

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDERS , GREGORY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SAFE HARBOR MARINAS, LLC

SERTIC, SCOT RICHARD

SUN COMMUNITIES, INC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

SERTIC, SCOT RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOSTICK, BRADLEY L

POIRIER, RONALD R.

QUAN, ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

7/13/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

6/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Answer to Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

8/6/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

Cross-Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

8/6/2021: Cross-Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

Notice of Filed

8/6/2021: Notice of Filed

Declaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Scot Richard Sertic

7/23/2021: Declaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Scot Richard Sertic

Proof of Service by Electronic re Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party ISO of Automatic Extensio

7/23/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic re Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party ISO of Automatic Extensio

Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

7/30/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

7/13/2021: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted

7/6/2021: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

6/11/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gregory Sanders

6/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gregory Sanders

Summons Issued and Filed

6/11/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Deposit Filed

6/11/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Deposit Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Communities, Inc. Filed

6/24/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Communities, Inc. Filed

Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Gregory Sanders

6/29/2021: Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Gregory Sanders

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC Filed

7/1/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Address Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Electronic re Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party ISO of Automatic Extensio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in support of Automatic Extension Filed by Scot Richard Sertic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Safe Harbor Marinas, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Dennis Hayashi Filed for Gregory Sanders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Sun Communities, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/25/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Deposit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Gregory Sanders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFE HARBOR MARINAS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN COMMUNITIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POIRIER, RONALD R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTICK, BRADLEY L.