This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 15:11:55 (UTC).

Sanchez VS Vanderbilt

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 Sanchez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Vanderbilt. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Frank Roesch. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4538

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Frank Roesch

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Emilio Sanchez

Defendants

Olivia Alexe

Tyler Ramsey Vanderbilt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CATHERINE ANN WALSH

Howard Eric Specter

 

Court Documents

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

05/13/2022: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

05/13/2022: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

04/08/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

03/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

03/28/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

03/04/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

03/04/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

02/22/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

02/18/2022: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

02/18/2022: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

02/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/04/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 17

10/04/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 02/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 17

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/01/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Emilio Sanchez

10/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Emilio Sanchez

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

10/01/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 05/13/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/22/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Tyler Ramsey Vanderbilt (Defendant); Olivia Alexe (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Tyler Ramsey Vanderbilt (Defendant); Olivia Alexe (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Tyler Ramsey Vanderbilt (Defendant); Olivia Alexe (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Emilio Sanchez (Plaintiff) As to: Olivia Alexe (Defendant) Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Robert Emilio Sanchez (Plaintiff) As to: Tyler Ramsey Vanderbilt (Defendant) Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketMessage: Reset - Court Unavailable, Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 05/13/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/29/2022 09:00 AM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 17; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Robert Emilio Sanchez (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 02/18/2022 09:00 AM D- 17; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Emilio Sanchez; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH, CATHERINE A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPECTER, HOWARD ERIC