This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 00:58:55 (UTC).

Sanchez VS Hyundai Motor America

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Sanchez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hyundai Motor America. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6919

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ, CECILIA

SANCHEZ, RAMIRO

Defendant

HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DOLIN, TIONNA

TAKAHASHI, BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/2/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

4/28/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/15/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

9/16/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

9/1/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled

9/1/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled

Case Management Statement of Cecilia Sanchez, Ramiro Sanchez Filed

9/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Cecilia Sanchez, Ramiro Sanchez Filed

Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration ans Stay Action Filed

8/26/2021: Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration ans Stay Action Filed

Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

8/26/2021: Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hyundai Motor America Filed

5/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Hyundai Motor America Filed

Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

6/18/2021: Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

6/21/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Proof of Service Filed

5/10/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Notice of of related case Filed

5/4/2021: Notice of of related case Filed

Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

4/22/2021: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cecilia Sanchez

4/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cecilia Sanchez

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

4/27/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/28/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel (Motion); Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Taken Under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Compel (Motion); Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Notice of Posting Jury Fee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 09/01/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Hyundai Motor America Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of related case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Cecilia Sanchez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLIN TIONNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAKAHASHI, BRIAN