This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 03:05:27 (UTC).

Salwan VS Donnelly

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Salwan filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Donnelly. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8964

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALWAN, RAJNEESH

Defendant

DONNELLY, SHEILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BENNETT-GOLDBERG, IAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/6/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

11/6/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

10/22/2020: Notice of Lis Pendens Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajneesh Salwan

10/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajneesh Salwan

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

10/22/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/22/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

11/18/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

4/1/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

3/29/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Rajneesh Salwan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less