This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/29/2020 at 03:47:57 (UTC).

SafeAmerica Credit Union VS Tyson

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 SafeAmerica Credit Union filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tyson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KARIN S SCHWARTZ and BENTRISH SATARZADEH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1064

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

BENTRISH SATARZADEH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFEAMERICA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

TYSON, PARTHINE LATRICE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

1/29/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

1/29/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

1/29/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

10/25/2019: Stipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

10/25/2019: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/19/2019: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/14/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Bentrish Satarzadeh; Department: Dept 519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketHearing Continued to Small Claims Court Trial dept: 519 date: 01/29/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Temporary Judge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 10/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 10/25/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less