This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 00:47:52 (UTC).

Safdari VS Dougan

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Safdari filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dougan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Delbert Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2798

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Delbert Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ahmad S. Safdari

Rohullah Saleha

Defendant

Derek Dougan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

A. King Aminpour

Charles J. Schmitt

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

9/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

05/24/2022: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

05/24/2022: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee

05/09/2022: Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee

Case Management Statement

05/09/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/09/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

01/25/2022: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

11/09/2021: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/01/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

11/01/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/01/2021: Answer

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

09/16/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

09/16/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 514

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

09/15/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ahmad S. Safdari

09/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ahmad S. Safdari

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

09/15/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/16/2022 at 02:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee Filed by: Ahmad S. Safdari (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Ahmad S. Safdari (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Derek Dougan (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: On the Court's own motion, Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/19/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/24/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Ahmad S. Safdari (Plaintiff); Rohullah Saleha (Plaintiff) As to: Derek Dougan (Defendant) Service Date: 10/01/2021 Service Cost: 299.95 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Reset - Court Unavailable, Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 03:00 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 514 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 05/19/2022 03:00 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Rescheduling or Relocation Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: Derek Dougan (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Derek Dougan (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: Derek Dougan (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 05/12/2022 03:00 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Ahmad S. Safdari; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMITT CHARLES J. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aminpour, A King