This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 01:46:11 (UTC).

Rush VS Chau

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 Rush filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Chau. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9441

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSH, EARL

Defendant

CHAU, KING V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROCK, GREGORY P.

KITTA, JOHN N.

KILLIAN, CLINTON O'KEEFE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/20/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant

8/24/2020: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed for Defendant

Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

9/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

10/20/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of King V. Chau Filed

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement of King V. Chau Filed

Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

6/19/2020: Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

3/12/2020: Case Management Statement of Earl Rush Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To King V. Chau

12/4/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To King V. Chau

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/16/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 12/16/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

8/1/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 12/16/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/1/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/31/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Earl Rush

7/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Earl Rush

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

7/31/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Complaint Other Real Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 302; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 06/08/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 05/17/2021 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/07/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to King V. Chau Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party King V. Chau Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurrer or Moving Party RE: Meet and Confer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to King V. Chau Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/16/2019 09:15 AM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Earl Rush

    Read MoreRead Less