This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/31/2020 at 08:09:59 (UTC).

Rudnick VS Castle

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 Rudnick filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against Castle. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE and RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7232

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUDNICK , JOANNA

Defendants

WESTHOFF, KIM CASTLE

CASTLE , ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TOBENER, JOSEPH S.

D'ARGENIO, MARK J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Order Pretrial Order Filed

9/30/2020: Order Pretrial Order Filed

Case Management Statement of Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff Filed

9/4/2020: Case Management Statement of Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff Filed

Notice of Payment of Jury Fees Filed

8/24/2020: Notice of Payment of Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of Joanna Rudnick Filed

9/1/2020: Case Management Statement of Joanna Rudnick Filed

Case Management Statement of Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff Filed

7/6/2020: Case Management Statement of Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/21/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Statement of Joanna Rudnick Filed

4/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Joanna Rudnick Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

5/8/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

12/12/2019: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/18/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/25/2020 08:30 AM D- 521

12/12/2019: Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 09/25/2020 08:30 AM D- 521

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/13/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/13/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 09/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

5/3/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 09/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joanna Rudnick

5/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joanna Rudnick

Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

5/1/2019: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/1/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Wrongful Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Status re: ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Pretrial Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 11/18/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPretrial Conference 04/12/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 03/24/2021 09:00 AM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/23/2021 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Joanna Rudnick Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Robert Castle, Robert Castle, Kim Castle Westhoff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/13/2019 03:00 PM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joanna Rudnick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Eviction Filed

    Read MoreRead Less