Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/17/2020 at 08:31:50 (UTC).

Ross VS Khan

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Ross filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Khan. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2134

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSS, HEATHER MICHELLE

Defendants

KHAN, AZIZURREHMAN

KHAN, ISMAIEL ALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HANCOCK, NICOLE N.

BARNETTE, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

1/8/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan

9/3/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan

Case Management Statement of Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan Filed

10/1/2019: Case Management Statement of Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan Filed

Case Management Statement of Heather Michelle Ross Filed

10/7/2019: Case Management Statement of Heather Michelle Ross Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/21/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/21/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ismaiel Ali Khan Filed

8/16/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Ismaiel Ali Khan Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Azizurrehman Khan Filed

8/16/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Azizurrehman Khan Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 10/21/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

6/10/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 10/21/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/10/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/7/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Heather Michelle Ross

6/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Heather Michelle Ross

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

6/7/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/09/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Heather Michelle Ross Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Ismaiel Ali Khan, Azizurrehman Khan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Azizurrehman Khan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Ismaiel Ali Khan Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/21/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Heather Michelle Ross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARNETTE, MATTHEW D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANCOCK, NICOLE N.