This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 02:07:53 (UTC).

Rosenberg VS Mosser

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Rosenberg filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Mosser. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WINIFRED Y. SMITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0160

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CALDERWOOD, MONTGOMERY

ROSENBERG, ANDREW

DONOUGHE, LOGAN

HODSON, BRIANNE

LEE, JOANNA

MORRISEY-GAMSO, NICHOLAS

FURTKAMP, RYAN

Defendants

THE MOSSER COMPANIES, INC.

553 SYCAMORE STREET ASSOCIATES, LP

YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC.

OAK-553 SYCAMORE, LLC

REALPAGE, INC.

DEPOSITIQ & RENTERSIQ INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC

MOSSER, NEVEO

YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SALINAS, ROBERT

NEUKOM, JOHN M.

SINGH, JAIKARAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference 07/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

6/1/2021: Case Management Conference 07/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

9/23/2021: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

9/23/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

Order to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, Mosser Companies, Inc., 553 Sycamore Street Associates, LP

9/23/2021: Order to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, Mosser Companies, Inc., 553 Sycamore Street Associates, LP

Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Mosser Companies, Inc. Filed

9/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Mosser Companies, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Depositiq & Rentersiq Insurance Agency, LLC Filed

9/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Depositiq & Rentersiq Insurance Agency, LLC Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Realpage, Inc. Filed

9/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Realpage, Inc. Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yes Energy Management, Inc. Filed

9/9/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yes Energy Management, Inc. Filed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

9/13/2021: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yes Energy Management,

8/24/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yes Energy Management,

Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Depositiq & Rentersiq

8/26/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Depositiq & Rentersiq

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

6/9/2021: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Case Management Statement of Andrew Rosenberg Filed

7/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Andrew Rosenberg Filed

Motion Granted

6/30/2021: Motion Granted

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/30/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/25/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Motion to Compel (Motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 21; Action: Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, Mosser Companies, Inc., 553 Sycamore Street Associates, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 10/29/2021 10:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Rosenberg, Brianne Hodson, Joanna Lee, Logan Donoughe, Montg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 07/29/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 06/30/2021 09:00 AM D- 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Rosenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YES ENERGY MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Yardi Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE MOSSER CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RealPage, Inc. is a litigant