Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 03:17:39 (UTC).

Roselli VS Kam

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Roselli filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kam. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JULIA SPAIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6137

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JULIA SPAIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

ROSELLI, DOMENIC EVAN

AIMAQ, BAHAR KATHRYN

Defendants, Debtor / Appellees and Cross Defendants

FARHANG, AHMAD

KAM, MANIJA WAIS

EXCEL REALTY & MORTGAGE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOJADDEDI, MUSA MOHAMMED

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

EXCEL REALTY & MORTGAGE, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOJADDEDI, MUSA MOHAMMED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BELLAFRONTO, MARIA S.

BRADLEY, MICHAEL P.

 

Court Documents

Dismissal As to Defendant: Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation , Musa Mohammed M

4/24/2020: Dismissal As to Defendant: Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation , Musa Mohammed M

Proof of Publication As to Manija Wais Kam, Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation

1/30/2020: Proof of Publication As to Manija Wais Kam, Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

2/6/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: cross-complaint Filed

Proof of Publication As to Manija Wais Kam, Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation

12/23/2019: Proof of Publication As to Manija Wais Kam, Excel Realty & Mortgage, Inc., a California Corporation

Summons Issued and Filed

12/10/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

11/12/2019: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Order Granting Service of Publication for Ahmad Farhang Filed

10/31/2019: Order Granting Service of Publication for Ahmad Farhang Filed

Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn A

10/1/2019: Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn A

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/14/2019: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Manija Wais Kam Filed

7/17/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Manija Wais Kam Filed

Proof of Service Filed

7/17/2019: Proof of Service Filed

Order granting Writ of Attachment Filed

7/18/2019: Order granting Writ of Attachment Filed

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

7/18/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Writ of Attachment Filed

7/18/2019: Writ of Attachment Filed

Application Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

7/10/2019: Application Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

Application Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

7/10/2019: Application Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

Application Re: Writ of Attachment Denied

7/12/2019: Application Re: Writ of Attachment Denied

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7/8/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo of credits interest & costs after judgment Filed for Bahar Kathryn Aimaq

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued To Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Entry of Judgment Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Ex Parte Application Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 512 date: 02/05/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Writ of Attachment Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration ISO Ex-Parte Application Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration ISO Ex-Parte Application Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Writ of Attachment Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli, Bahar Kathryn Aimaq - Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/20/2019 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Domenic Evan Roselli

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXCEL REALTY & MORTGAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bellafronto, Maria Susan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY, MICHAEL P